OH SB43 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Passed on October 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-27 - Effective
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Passed on October 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-27 - Effective
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 323.151, 323.152, 323.153, 4503.064, 4503.065, and 4503.066 of the Revised Code to modify the homestead exemption for the surviving spouse of a disabled veteran.
Title
Modify homestead exemption-surviving spouse of a disabled veteran
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-27 | Effective | |
2023-07-28 | Signed By The Governor | |
2023-07-20 | Sent To The Governor | |
2023-06-30 | House | Passed - Amended |
2023-06-27 | House | Informally passed |
2023-06-26 | House | Reported - Amended: Rules and Reference |
2023-06-26 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported: Ways and Means |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred to committee: Ways and Means |
2023-04-04 | House | Introduced |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reported: Ways and Means |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to committee: Ways and Means |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
House Rules and Reference Committee
House Ways and Means Committee
Military and Veterans
Senate Ways and Means Committee
Taxation
House Ways and Means Committee
Military and Veterans
Senate Ways and Means Committee
Taxation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 23 | 151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 23 | 152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 23 | 153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 03 | 064 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 03 | 065 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 03 | 066 | Amended Code | Citation Text |