OH SB40 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Effective 3/24/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Effective 3/24/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3333.31, 3345.021, and 3345.21 and to enact sections 3345.0211, 3345.0212, 3345.0213, and 3345.0214 of the Revised Code to expand the "Forever Buckeye" program by granting in-state college tuition to individuals who receive a certificate of high school equivalence in Ohio and to enact the "Forming Open and Robust University Minds Act" regarding free speech on college campuses.
Title
Enact the Forming Open and Robust University Minds Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Effective 3/24/21 | |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2020-12-02 | House | Passed |
2020-11-24 | House | Reported - Substitute: Higher Education |
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Higher Education |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Passed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Education |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Education |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 33 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 45 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 45 | 0211 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 45 | 0212 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 45 | 0213 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 45 | 0214 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 45 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |