OH SB4 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Effective 10/13/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 307.86, 339.05, 505.08, 731.14, 749.37, and 5540.03 of the Revised Code to apply the Prevailing Wage Law to transportation improvement district projects under certain circumstances, to temporarily expand the use of certain tax increment financing payments, to exempt personal protective equipment from certain political subdivision competitive bidding law during the period of the emergency declared by Executive Order 2020-01D, issued on March 9, 2020, and to make capital appropriations to the Facilities Construction Commission and the Public Works Commission for the biennium ending June 30, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make capital appropriations for school facilities assistance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-13 Effective 10/13/20
2020-06-24SenateConcurred in House amendments
2020-06-11HousePassed - Amended
2020-06-11HouseInformally passed
2020-06-11HouseReported: Rules and Reference
2019-07-23HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2019-07-18HouseInformally passed
2019-07-17HouseInformally passed
2019-07-16HouseInformally passed
2019-07-15HouseInformally passed
2019-07-12HouseInformally passed
2019-07-11HouseInformally passed
2019-07-10HouseInformally passed
2019-07-09HouseInformally passed
2019-07-08HouseInformally passed
2019-07-02HouseInformally passed
2019-06-30HouseInformally passed
2019-06-29HouseInformally passed
2019-06-28HouseInformally passed
2019-06-27HouseInformally passed
2019-05-30HouseReported: Finance
2019-05-14HouseRe-referred: Finance
2019-05-08HouseReported: Primary and Secondary Education
2019-04-02HouseRefer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
2019-03-29HouseIntroduced
2019-03-27SenatePassed
2019-03-13SenateReported: Finance
2019-02-19SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30786Amended CodeCitation Text
33905Amended CodeCitation Text
50508Amended CodeCitation Text
554003Amended CodeCitation Text
73114Amended CodeCitation Text
74937Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-SB-4
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb4/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb4/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb4/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb4/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb4/RCH/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb4/RH/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb4/RH/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb4/PH/07?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb4/CS/08?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb4/EN/09?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-SB-4

Bill Comments

feedback