OH SB4 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2951.041 and 2953.38 and to enact section 2953.521 of the Revised Code to allow a person who is found not guilty of an offense or who is the defendant named in a dismissed criminal charge to apply for a court order to expunge the person's official records in the case if the charge or not guilty finding was the result of the applicant having been a human trafficking victim; to allow a person convicted of certain prostitution-related offenses to apply for the expungement of the conviction record of any offense, other than a specified disqualifying offense, the person's participation in which was a result of having been a human trafficking victim; and to allow intervention in lieu of conviction for persons charged with committing an offense while a victim of compelling prostitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expand expungement and intervention

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2017-05-18HouseIntroduced
2017-05-17SenatePassed
2017-05-10SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2017-02-01SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2951Amended CodeCitation Text
2951041Amended CodeCitation Text
2953Amended CodeCitation Text
295338Amended CodeCitation Text
2953521New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback