OH SB38 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 5.2289 of the Revised Code to designate the first week in October as "Nonviolence Week."
Title
To designate the first week in October as "Nonviolence Week."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-11 | Effective Date | |
2013-07-11 | Governor' Action | |
2013-07-19 | End of 10-day period | |
2013-07-08 | Sent to Governor | |
2013-06-26 | Concurrence | |
2013-04-23 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-03-13 | Committee Report | |
2013-02-12 | To Public Safety, Local Government & Veteran Affairs | |
2013-02-12 | Introduced to House | |
2013-06-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-05-22 | Committee Report | |
2013-04-24 | To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2013-04-24 | Introduced to Senate |