OH SB37 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 13 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - Passed - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 109.804 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 243.20 of Am. Sub. H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly to require the Ohio Peace Officer Training Commission to develop and conduct a chief of police training course for certain newly appointed chiefs of police.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Develop and conduct training for new police chiefs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-13HousePassed - Amended
2017-06-21HouseReported - Amended: State and Local Government
2017-05-09HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2017-03-23HouseIntroduced
2017-03-22SenatePassed
2017-03-07SenateReported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-02-08SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-02-07SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
109New CodeSee Bill Text
109804New CodeSee Bill Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
505Amended CodeCitation Text
50549Amended CodeCitation Text
7Amended CodeCitation Text
737Amended CodeCitation Text
737052Amended CodeCitation Text
73715Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback