OH SB37 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-40)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-18 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-18 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 5533.051 and to enact sections 5501.313, 5533.182, 5533.183, 5533.221, 5533.542, 5533.725, 5533.755, 5533.831, 5533.832, 5533.921, and 5533.98 of the Revised Code to permit the Director of Transportation to designate portions of state highways as memorial highways in honor of each State Highway Patrol trooper who is or has been killed in the line of duty, and to designate a number of memorial highways.
Title
To permit the Director of Transportation to designate portions of state highways as memorial highways in honor of each State Highway Patrol trooper who is or has been killed in the line of duty, and to designate a number of memorial highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-11-21 | Committee Report | |
2011-02-01 | To Highways & Transportation | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced to House | |
2012-12-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-12-11 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-01-19 | To Transportation, Public Safety & Homeland Security | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
55 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 01 | 313 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 01 | 70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
55 | 33 | 051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 33 | 182 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 183 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 221 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 542 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 725 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 755 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 831 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 832 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 921 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 98 | New Code | See Bill Text |