OH SB369 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-11-19 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2743.51, 2743.59, 2743.60, 2743.65, 2743.66, and 2743.71 of the Revised Code to revise the eligibility standards and procedure for awarding reparations to crime victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise eligibility and procedures for crime victim reparations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19HouseIntroduced
2020-11-18SenatePassed
2020-11-18SenateReported: Judiciary
2020-09-23SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2020-09-22SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
274351Amended CodeCitation Text
274359Amended CodeCitation Text
274360Amended CodeCitation Text
274365Amended CodeCitation Text
274366Amended CodeCitation Text
274371Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback