OH SB361 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-10)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-10)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2901.21 and 2901.22 and to enact section 2901.20 of the Revised Code to clarify when strict criminal liability is imposed or a degree of culpability is required for the commission of an offense, to modify the concept of acting recklessly, and to require that future acts creating criminal offenses specify the requisite degree of culpability.
Title
To clarify when strict criminal liability is imposed or a degree of culpability is required for the commission of an offense, to modify the concept of acting recklessly, and to require that future acts creating criminal offenses specify the requisite degree of culpability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-17 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-12-04 | Committee Report - A | |
2014-09-08 | To Criminal Justice | |
2014-09-08 | Introduced to House | |
2014-12-17 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-17 | Committee Report | |
2014-12-04 | To Judiciary | |
2014-12-04 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 01 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 01 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 01 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |