OH SB357 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Engrossed on September 2 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-08 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend Section 27 of H.B. 481 of the 133rd General Assembly to provide for the distribution of some federal coronavirus relief funding to local subdivisions, to make an appropriation, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distribute federal corona virus relief funding to local govts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-08HouseIntroduced
2020-09-02SenatePassed
2020-09-02SenateReported - Substitute: Finance
2020-09-01SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2020-08-27SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback