OH SB351 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-7)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-17 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-17 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 5.2269 of the Revised Code to designate August 31 as "Ohio Overdose Awareness Day."
Title
Designate Ohio Overdose Awareness Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2020-09-30 | House | Introduced |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Reported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Passed |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services : Public Health
Special Designations : State Symbols
State and Local Government : State Government
Special Designations : State Symbols
State and Local Government : State Government