OH SB338 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-29 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-29 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3717.33 and 3717.52 of the Revised Code to require the Director of Agriculture and the Director of Health to adopt rules governing the assessment of registered environmental health specialists and environmental health specialists in training who conduct inspections of retail food establishments and food service operations.
Title
Regards assessment of registered environmental health specialists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-29 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2022-11-22 | House | Introduced |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Passed |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture : Food Regulation
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Public Health
Agriculture : Food Regulation
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Public Health
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 17 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 17 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |