OH SB331 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 956.01, 956.03, 956.04, 956.12, 956.13, 956.14, 956.15, 956.18, 959.15, 959.99, 1717.06, 4111.02, 4939.01, 4939.02, 4939.03, and 4939.08; to enact sections 956.051, 956.181, 956.19, 956.20, 956.21, 956.22, 956.23, 956.99, 959.21, 4113.85, 4939.031, 4939.032, 4939.033, 4939.035, 4939.037, 4939.038, 4939.039, 4939.0311, 4939.0313, 4939.0315, 4939.0317, 4939.0319, 4939.0321, 4939.0325, and 4939.0327 of the Revised Code; and to amend Section 211.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 64 of the 131st General Assembly to regulate the sale of dogs from pet stores and dog retailers, to require the Director of Agriculture to license pet stores, and to revise the civil penalties applicable to dog breeders and other specified entities; to govern construction and attachment activities related to micro wireless facilities in the public way; to prohibit political subdivisions from establishing minimum wage rates different from the rate required by state law; to generally grant private employers exclusive authority to establish policies concerning hours and location of work, scheduling, and fringe benefits, unless an exception applies; to prohibit a person from engaging in sexual conduct with an animal and related acts, to provide for the seizure and impoundment of an animal that is the subject of a violation, and to authorize a sentencing court to require an offender to undergo psychological evaluation or counseling; to prohibit and establish an increased penalty for knowingly engaging in activities associated with cockfighting, bearbaiting, or pitting an animal against another; to remove the residency requirement for the appointment of an agent to a county humane society; and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulate dog sales and license pet stores

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-07HousePassed
2016-12-07HouseReported - Substitute: Finance
2016-12-07SenateConcurred in House amendments
2016-11-10HouseRefer to Committee: Finance
2016-05-31HouseIntroduced
2016-05-25SenatePassed
2016-05-25SenateReported - Substitute: Finance
2016-05-18SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2016-05-17SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1717Amended CodeCitation Text
171706Amended CodeCitation Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4111Amended CodeCitation Text
411102Amended CodeCitation Text
4113New CodeSee Bill Text
411385New CodeSee Bill Text
49Amended CodeCitation Text
4939Amended CodeCitation Text
493901Amended CodeCitation Text
493902Amended CodeCitation Text
493903Amended CodeCitation Text
4939031New CodeSee Bill Text
49390311New CodeSee Bill Text
49390313New CodeSee Bill Text
49390315New CodeSee Bill Text
49390317New CodeSee Bill Text
49390319New CodeSee Bill Text
4939032New CodeSee Bill Text
49390321New CodeSee Bill Text
49390325New CodeSee Bill Text
49390327New CodeSee Bill Text
4939033New CodeSee Bill Text
4939035New CodeSee Bill Text
4939037New CodeSee Bill Text
4939038New CodeSee Bill Text
4939039New CodeSee Bill Text
493908Amended CodeCitation Text
9Amended CodeCitation Text
956Amended CodeCitation Text
95601Amended CodeCitation Text
95603Amended CodeCitation Text
95604Amended CodeCitation Text
956051New CodeSee Bill Text
95612Amended CodeCitation Text
95613Amended CodeCitation Text
95614Amended CodeCitation Text
95615Amended CodeCitation Text
95618Amended CodeCitation Text
956181New CodeSee Bill Text
95619New CodeSee Bill Text
95620New CodeSee Bill Text
95621New CodeSee Bill Text
95622New CodeSee Bill Text
95623New CodeSee Bill Text
95699New CodeSee Bill Text
959Amended CodeCitation Text
95915Amended CodeCitation Text
95921New CodeSee Bill Text
95999Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback