OH SB33 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Refer to Committee: Public Utilities
Pending: House Public Utilities Committee
Hearing: Sep 26 @ 11:00 am in Room 116
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2909.07, 2909.10, 2911.21, 2911.211, 2917.21, and 2917.32 and to enact section 2307.67 of the Revised Code to modify certain criminal offenses with respect to critical infrastructure facilities and to impose fines and civil liability for damage to a critical infrastructure facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify criminal and civil law for critical infrastructure damage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseRefer to Committee: Public Utilities
2019-05-06HouseIntroduced
2019-05-01SenatePassed
2019-05-01SenateReported: Judiciary
2019-02-19SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23New CodeSee Bill Text
2307New CodeSee Bill Text
230767New CodeSee Bill Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2909Amended CodeCitation Text
290907Amended CodeCitation Text
290910Amended CodeCitation Text
2911Amended CodeCitation Text
291121Amended CodeCitation Text
2911211Amended CodeCitation Text
2917Amended CodeCitation Text
291721Amended CodeCitation Text
291732Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback