OH SB323 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-9)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 109.67 of the Revised Code to require the Attorney General to create and maintain a statewide tracking system for the processing of sexual assault examination kits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide tracking system for processing sex assault exam kits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-06HouseIntroduced
2018-12-05SenatePassed
2018-12-03SenateReported: Judiciary
2018-09-25SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2018-08-09SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
109New CodeSee Bill Text
10967New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback