OH SB321 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Effective 9/28/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Effective 9/28/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 149.43, 149.433, 2323.52, 2743.03, 2746.04, and 3333.0412 and to enact section 2743.75 of the Revised Code to create a procedure within the Court of Claims to hear complaints alleging a denial of access to public records, to modify the circumstances under which a person who files a mandamus action seeking the release of public records may be awarded court costs and attorney's fees, to expand the infrastructure record exemption under Public Records Law, and to generally protect a private, nonprofit institution of higher education from liability for a breach of confidentiality or other claim that arises from the institution's disclosure of public records.
Title
Creates alternative remedy for public records denials
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Faber [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Effective 9/28/16 | |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed |
2016-05-17 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2016-05-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
State and Local Government : Public Records
State and Local Government : State Government
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
State and Local Government : Public Records
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 49 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 49 | 433 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 23 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
27 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
27 | 43 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 43 | 75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 46 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
27 | 46 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 33 | 0412 | Amended Code | Citation Text |