OH SB320 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4743.04 and 5903.04 and to enact section 4743.041 of the Revised Code to require state occupational licensing agencies, under certain circumstances, to issue temporary licenses or certificates to members of the military and spouses who are licensed in another jurisdiction and have moved to Ohio for active duty.
Title
Issue temporary license to out-of-state licensee on active duty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | House | Introduced |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Military and Veterans
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
State and Local Government : State Government
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 43 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 43 | 041 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
59 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
59 | 03 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |