OH SB32 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2945.71 and 2945.73 of the Revised Code to provide a prosecutor an additional fourteen days to commence a trial after a person charged with a felony has been discharged because the person has not been brought to trial within the required amount of time and to authorize the court to release the person from detention in connection with those charges pending trial.
Title
Narrow scope of speedy trial rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2017-05-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 45 | 71 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 45 | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |