OH SB309 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3749.01 of the Revised Code to allow certified swimming classes to take place at a private residential swimming pool without requiring the pool's operator to obtain a public swimming pool license and to declare an emergency.
Title
Permit swimming classes at private pool without pool license
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2020-06-02 | House | Introduced |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Public Health
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Health and Human Services : Public Health
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 49 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |