OH SB307 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-05 - Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight
Pending: House Government Accountability and Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To repeal section 1.49 of the Revised Code to eliminate the rule of construction regarding a court's considerations in determining the intention of the legislature when a statute is ambiguous.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminate rule specifying considerations when statute ambiguous

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-05HouseRefer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-11-29HouseIntroduced
2018-11-28SenatePassed
2018-11-28SenateReported: Judiciary
2018-06-19SenateRe-referred: Judiciary
2018-06-06SenateRefer to Committee: Rules and Reference
2018-06-05SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback