OH SB302 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Informally passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Informally passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4765.401 of the Revised Code regarding emergency medical services and stroke patient protocols.
Title
Regards emergency medical services and stroke patient protocols
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | House | Informally passed |
2020-12-16 | House | Reported: Health |
2020-12-08 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2020-12-03 | House | Introduced |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-04-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 65 | 401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |