OH SB300 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-29 - Refer to Committee: Civil Justice
Pending: House Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-29 - Refer to Committee: Civil Justice
Pending: House Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 147.01, 147.011, 147.03, 147.14, 147.141, 147.371, 147.53, 147.542, 147.55, 147.551, and 147.591 and to enact sections 147.49 and 147.50 of the Revised Code to amend the law regarding notaries public.
Title
Revise notaries public law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-29 | House | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2022-11-22 | House | Introduced |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Passed |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Reported: General Government Budget Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Refer to Committee: General Government Budget Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 141 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 371 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 49 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 47 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 47 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 542 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 551 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 47 | 591 | Amended Code | Citation Text |