OH SB30 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-28)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Effective 9/7/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 5.2269 of the Revised Code to designate August 31 as "Ohio Overdose Awareness Day."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Ohio Overdose Awareness Day

Sponsors

Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]
Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]
Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]
Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]
Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]
Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]
Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]
Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]
Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]
Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]
Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]
Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]
Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26 Effective 9/7/21
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-18HouseReported: Behavioral Health and Recovery Supports
2021-03-03HouseRefer to Committee: Behavioral Health and Recovery Supports
2021-02-24SenatePassed
2021-02-24SenateReported: Health
2021-02-03SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-30
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb30/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb30/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb30/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb30/RH/03/sb30_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb30/PH/04/sb30_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb30/EN/05/sb30_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15533&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15708&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15742&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15753&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15771&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15804&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16691&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16745&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16744&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16867&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16890&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17109&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-30

Bill Comments

feedback