OH SB3 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Effective 9/30/21 - Certain provisions effective January 1, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 9.79, 109.572, 4723.34, 5123.169, 5123.1611, and 5123.452 and to enact sections 4723.11, 4723.111, 4723.112, 4723.113, 4723.114, 4723.115, and 4723.116 of the Revised Code to enter into the Nurse Licensure Compact and to revise the law governing occupational license restrictions for individuals convicted of criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enter into the Nurse Licensure Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24 Effective 9/30/21 - Certain provisions effective January 1, 2023
2021-06-24SenateConcurred in House amendments
2021-06-23HousePassed
2021-06-09HouseReported - Substitute: Health
2021-03-03HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2021-02-24SenatePassed
2021-02-10SenateReported: Health
2021-01-26SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
109572Amended CodeCitation Text
472311New CodeSee Bill Text
4723111New CodeSee Bill Text
4723112New CodeSee Bill Text
4723113New CodeSee Bill Text
4723114New CodeSee Bill Text
4723115New CodeSee Bill Text
4723116New CodeSee Bill Text
472334Amended CodeCitation Text
51231611Amended CodeCitation Text
5123169Amended CodeCitation Text
5123452Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-3
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb3/IN/00/sb3_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb3/RS/01/sb3_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb3/PS/02/sb3_02_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb3/RH/03/sb3_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb3/PH/04/sb3_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb3/EN/05/sb3_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15474&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15507&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15608&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15607&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15776&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15803&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16957&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16993&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17002&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17168&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17263&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17334&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-3

Bill Comments

feedback