OH SB3 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 109.572, 128.04, 177.01, 1901.186, 1901.20, 1901.261, 1907.02, 1907.261, 2152.021, 2152.18, 2743.60, 2901.13, 2921.45, 2923.01, 2923.02, 2923.13, 2923.241, 2923.31, 2923.41, 2925.01, 2925.02, 2925.03, 2925.04, 2925.041, 2925.05, 2925.06, 2925.11, 2925.12, 2925.13, 2925.14, 2925.141, 2925.22, 2925.23, 2925.36, 2925.37, 2925.38, 2925.42, 2925.51, 2927.21, 2929.01, 2929.13, 2929.14, 2929.141, 2929.141, 2929.15, 2929.17, 2929.18, 2929.21, 2929.25, 2929.26, 2929.34, 2931.03, 2933.51, 2935.36, 2941.1410, 2945.71, 2949.12, 2951.041, 2953.31, 2953.32, 2953.52, 2967.18, 2967.19, 2967.28, 2981.01, 3301.32, 3301.541, 3313.662, 3319.31, 3319.39, 3712.09, 3719.013, 3719.21, 3719.99, 3721.121, 3734.44, 3767.01, 4112.02, 4510.17, 4729.99, 4742.03, 5103.0319, 5119.36, 5119.37, 5119.93, 5119.94, 5120.16, 5120.53, 5149.38, 5153.111, and 5502.13 and to enact sections 109.749, 181.27, 2152.75, 2901.10, 2925.031, 2925.032, 2925.111, and 2925.112 of the Revised Code to modify the controlled substance possession and trafficking prohibitions and penalties, modify the drug and alcohol abuse civil commitment mechanism, require the State Criminal Sentencing Commission to study the impact of those changes, and prohibit restraining or confining a woman or child who is a charged, convicted, or adjudicated criminal offender or delinquent child at certain points during pregnancy or postpartum recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Express intent to reform drug sentencing laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-17HouseReported - Substitute: Criminal Justice
2020-08-31HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2020-07-07HouseIntroduced
2020-06-30SenatePassed
2020-06-30SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2019-02-13SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
109572Amended CodeCitation Text
109749New CodeSee Bill Text
12804Amended CodeCitation Text
17701Amended CodeCitation Text
18127New CodeSee Bill Text
1901186Amended CodeCitation Text
190120Amended CodeCitation Text
1901261Amended CodeCitation Text
190702Amended CodeCitation Text
1907261Amended CodeCitation Text
2152021Amended CodeCitation Text
215218Amended CodeCitation Text
215275New CodeSee Bill Text
274360Amended CodeCitation Text
290110New CodeSee Bill Text
290113Amended CodeCitation Text
292145Amended CodeCitation Text
292301Amended CodeCitation Text
292302Amended CodeCitation Text
292313Amended CodeCitation Text
2923241Amended CodeCitation Text
292331Amended CodeCitation Text
292341Amended CodeCitation Text
292501Amended CodeCitation Text
292502Amended CodeCitation Text
292503Amended CodeCitation Text
2925031New CodeSee Bill Text
2925032New CodeSee Bill Text
292504Amended CodeCitation Text
2925041Amended CodeCitation Text
292505Amended CodeCitation Text
292506Amended CodeCitation Text
292511Amended CodeCitation Text
2925111New CodeSee Bill Text
2925112New CodeSee Bill Text
292512Amended CodeCitation Text
292513Amended CodeCitation Text
292514Amended CodeCitation Text
2925141Amended CodeCitation Text
292522Amended CodeCitation Text
292523Amended CodeCitation Text
292536Amended CodeCitation Text
292537Amended CodeCitation Text
292538Amended CodeCitation Text
292542Amended CodeCitation Text
292551Amended CodeCitation Text
292721Amended CodeCitation Text
292901Amended CodeCitation Text
292913Amended CodeCitation Text
292914Amended CodeCitation Text
2929141Amended CodeCitation Text
292915Amended CodeCitation Text
292917Amended CodeCitation Text
292918Amended CodeCitation Text
292921Amended CodeCitation Text
292925Amended CodeCitation Text
292926Amended CodeCitation Text
292934Amended CodeCitation Text
293103Amended CodeCitation Text
293351Amended CodeCitation Text
293536Amended CodeCitation Text
29411410Amended CodeCitation Text
294571Amended CodeCitation Text
294912Amended CodeCitation Text
2951041Amended CodeCitation Text
295331Amended CodeCitation Text
295332Amended CodeCitation Text
295352Amended CodeCitation Text
296718Amended CodeCitation Text
296719Amended CodeCitation Text
296728Amended CodeCitation Text
298101Amended CodeCitation Text
330132Amended CodeCitation Text
3301541Amended CodeCitation Text
3313662Amended CodeCitation Text
331931Amended CodeCitation Text
331939Amended CodeCitation Text
371209Amended CodeCitation Text
3719013Amended CodeCitation Text
371921Amended CodeCitation Text
371999Amended CodeCitation Text
3721121Amended CodeCitation Text
373444Amended CodeCitation Text
376701Amended CodeCitation Text
411202Amended CodeCitation Text
451017Amended CodeCitation Text
472999Amended CodeCitation Text
474203Amended CodeCitation Text
51030319Amended CodeCitation Text
511936Amended CodeCitation Text
511937Amended CodeCitation Text
511993Amended CodeCitation Text
511994Amended CodeCitation Text
512016Amended CodeCitation Text
512053Amended CodeCitation Text
514938Amended CodeCitation Text
5153111Amended CodeCitation Text
550213Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback