OH SB3 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-28)
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Effective 2/5/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-28)
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Effective 2/5/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.281 of the Revised Code to designate the first week of May as In-Demand Jobs Week.
Title
Review workforce development laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Effective 2/5/18 | |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2017-10-24 | House | Passed |
2017-10-12 | House | Reported - Substitute: Higher Education and Workforce Development |
2017-05-09 | House | Refer to Committee: Higher Education and Workforce Development |
2017-05-01 | House | Introduced |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced |