OH SB299 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-30)
Status: Passed on October 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-10 - Effective 10/10/18 - Certain appropriations effective July 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 5747.50; to enact sections 3333.80, 3333.801, and 3333.802 of the Revised Code; and to amend Sections 211.10, 211.20, 259.10, 259.60, 373.10, 373.20, 381.10, and 381.450 of Am. Sub. H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly, Section 387.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly, as subsequently amended, Sections 207.230, 207.440, 221.10, 221.13, 223.10, 223.15, and 223.40 of H.B. 529 of the 132nd General Assembly, and Section 227.10 of H.B. 529 of the 132nd General Assembly, as subsequently amended to credit additional amounts of the Local Government Fund to fund public safety services in areas that experienced a 30% or more decrease in the taxable value of certain power plants between 2016 and 2017, to phase out the payments over ten years, to increase the appropriation to the Local Government Fund; to support broadband development; to establish the OhioCorps Pilot Project; and to make appropriations, including appropriations for the protection and preservation of Lake Erie and the National Guard Scholarship Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Finance projects for protection of Lake Erie and its basin

Sponsors

Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]
Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]
Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Sen. Michael Skindell [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]
Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]
Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]
Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Bill Dean [R]Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Brian Hill [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Nathan Manning [R]
Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]
Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]
Rep. Ron Young [R]

Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-10 Effective 10/10/18 - Certain appropriations effective July 11, 2018
2018-06-27HousePassed - Amended
2018-06-27HouseInformally passed
2018-06-27SenateConcurred in House amendments
2018-06-27HouseReported - Substitute: Finance
2018-06-20HouseRefer to Committee: Finance
2018-06-07HouseIntroduced
2018-06-06SenatePassed
2018-06-06SenateReported - Substitute: Finance
2018-05-10SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2018-05-09SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
154Amended CodeCitation Text
15422Amended CodeCitation Text
33New CodeSee Bill Text
3333New CodeSee Bill Text
333380New CodeSee Bill Text
3333801New CodeSee Bill Text
3333802New CodeSee Bill Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574750Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback