OH SB296 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - Concurred in House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - Concurred in House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3501.17, 3501.28, 3501.32, 3505.18, 3505.181, and 3505.183 and to enact sections 2505.40, 3501.321, and 3501.40 of the Revised Code to specify requirements for lawsuits concerning election procedures, to specify the conditions under which a court may order that a polling place be kept open for extended hours on the day of an election, and to require a person who votes during those extended hours to cast a provisional ballot.
Title
Regulate keeping polls open after closing time
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed |
2016-05-17 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2016-05-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Civil Justice |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
25 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 05 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
35 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 01 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 01 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 01 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 01 | 321 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 01 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 05 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 05 | 181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 05 | 182 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 05 | 183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |