OH SB277 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Enrolled on December 17 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - Amendments laid over under the rule
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 122.58, 135.182, 169.05, 169.07, 169.08, and 742.38 of the Revised Code to revise the Ohio Pooled Collateral Program, the Unclaimed Funds Law, and the Ohio Police and Fire Pension Fund disability determination procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change Ohio Pooled Collateral Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-23SenateAmendments laid over under the rule
2020-12-17HousePassed
2020-12-02HouseReported - Substitute: Financial Institutions
2020-06-10HouseRefer to Committee: Financial Institutions
2020-06-09HouseIntroduced
2020-06-03SenatePassed
2020-06-03SenateReported: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-02-12SenateRefer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-02-11SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12258Amended CodeCitation Text
135182Amended CodeCitation Text
16905Amended CodeCitation Text
16907Amended CodeCitation Text
16908Amended CodeCitation Text
74238Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback