OH SB274 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1345.22, 4505.02, 4505.101, 4505.11, 4505.17, 4513.60, 4513.61, 4513.66, and 4921.25 and to enact sections 4505.191, 4513.601, 4513.611, 4513.67, 4513.68, and 4513.69 of the Revised Code to authorize towing companies to obtain title to vehicles removed from private tow-away zones that remain unclaimed, to revise the process by which a repair garage or place of storage may obtain title to vehicles left unclaimed at the repair garage or place of storage, to revise the procedures and penalties related to the towing of motor vehicles, to deem a scrap metal dealer to have valid title to a motor vehicle in specified circumstances, to make other changes in the law governing towing motor vehicles, to alter the law governing the evidence required for the issuance of a salvage certificate of title, to specify exemptions from the buyer's cooling-off period for a seller of home security systems to commence services, and to expand the manners of providing cancellation notices in home solicitation sales.
Title
To authorize towing companies to obtain title to vehicles removed from private tow-away zones that remain unclaimed, to revise the process by which a repair garage or place of storage may obtain title to vehicles left unclaimed at the repair garage or place of storage, to revise the procedures and penalties related to the towing of motor vehicles, to deem a scrap metal dealer to have valid title to a motor vehicle in specified circumstances, to make other changes in the law governing towing motor vehicles, to alter the law governing the evidence required for the issuance of a salvage certificate of title, to specify exemptions from the buyer's cooling-off period for a seller of home security systems to commence services, and to expand the manners of providing cancellation notices in home solicitation sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-30 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-12-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-12-11 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-12-04 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-02-11 | To State Government Oversight & Reform | |
2014-02-11 | Introduced to House | |
2014-12-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-10 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-12-04 | To Commerce, Labor and Technology | |
2014-12-04 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
13 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
13 | 45 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 05 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 05 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 05 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 05 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 05 | 191 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 11 | 80 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 13 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 13 | 601 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 13 | 61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 13 | 611 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 13 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 13 | 67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 13 | 68 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 13 | 69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
49 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 21 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 21 | 251 | New Code | See Bill Text |