OH SB273 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3305.07, 3305.10, 3956.01, 3956.03, 3956.04, 3956.06, 3956.07, 3956.08, 3956.09, 3956.10, 3956.11, 3956.12, 3956.13, 3956.16, 3956.18, and 3956.20; to enact new section 3956.19; and to repeal section 3956.19 of the Revised Code to amend the law governing the Ohio Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association and to make changes regarding required distributions under an alternative retirement plan.
Title
Regards Ohio Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective 9/13/22 | |
2022-06-01 | House | Reported: Insurance |
2022-06-01 | House | Passed |
2022-05-17 | House | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2022-04-12 | House | Introduced |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Insurance |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 05 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 05 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 19 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 56 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |