OH SB273 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 3901.072, 3901.073, 3901.074, 3901.075, 3901.076, 3901.077, and 3901.078 of the Revised Code to enact the Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Act.
Title
Enacts the Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Bacon [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-07 | House | Passed |
2016-12-07 | House | Reported - Amended: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2016-11-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2016-05-19 | House | Introduced |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Reported: Insurance |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
39 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 01 | 072 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 073 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 074 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 075 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 076 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 077 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 078 | New Code | See Bill Text |