OH SB27 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Effective 9/7/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 148.01 and 148.04 and to enact sections 148.041 and 148.042 of the Revised Code to authorize automatic enrollment of new state government employees in the Ohio Public Employees Deferred Compensation Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize Deferred Comp auto enrollment/state employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26 Effective 9/7/21
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-19HouseReported: Insurance
2021-03-16HouseRefer to Committee: Insurance
2021-03-10SenatePassed
2021-03-02SenateReported: Insurance
2021-01-27SenateRefer to Committee: Insurance
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
14801Amended CodeCitation Text
14804Amended CodeCitation Text
148041New CodeSee Bill Text
148042New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-27
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb27/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb27/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb27/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb27/RH/03/sb27_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb27/PH/04/sb27_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb27/EN/05/sb27_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15549&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15663&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15841&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15989&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16002&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16155&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16758&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16835&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16870&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16877&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16876&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17275&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-27

Bill Comments

feedback