OH SB27 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-29)
Status: Passed on January 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Effective 1/18/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 5.2281 of the Revised Code to designate the period beginning March 13 and ending April 15 as "Ohio Deaf History Month."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate a commemorative month

Sponsors

Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. John Eklund [R]
Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]
Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Troy Balderson [R]Sen. William Coley [R]
Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]
Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Michael Skindell [D]
Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]
Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]
Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Wes Retherford [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Rezabek [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]
Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]
Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Martin Sweeney [D]
Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]

Roll Calls

2017-10-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-18 Effective 1/18/18
2017-10-11HousePassed
2017-04-25HouseReported: State and Local Government
2017-03-14HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2017-03-08HouseIntroduced
2017-03-07SenatePassed
2017-03-02SenateReported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2017-02-01SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback