OH SB265 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-22)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-27 - Speaker Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 173.12, 341.192, 1739.05, 1751.01, 3702.30, 3712.06, 3712.061, 3963.01, and 5167.12 and to enact sections 1751.91, 3901.83, 3901.831, 3901.832, 3901.833, 3923.89, 5164.14, 5164.7512, 5164.7514, and 5167.121 of the Revised Code to permit certain health insurers to provide payment or reimbursement for services lawfully provided by a pharmacist, to adopt requirements related to step therapy protocols, and to recognize pharmacist services in certain other laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit health insurers to cover pharmacist-provided benefits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-27HouseSpeaker Signed
2018-12-19SenateConcurred in House amendments
2018-12-13HousePassed
2018-12-13HouseInformally passed
2018-12-13HouseReported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-12-05HouseRefer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-11-29HouseIntroduced
2018-11-28SenatePassed
2018-11-28SenateReported - Amended: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2018-03-21SenateRefer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
173Amended CodeCitation Text
17312Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1739Amended CodeCitation Text
173905Amended CodeCitation Text
1751Amended CodeCitation Text
175101Amended CodeCitation Text
175191New CodeSee Bill Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
341Amended CodeCitation Text
341192Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3702Amended CodeCitation Text
370230Amended CodeCitation Text
3712Amended CodeCitation Text
371206Amended CodeCitation Text
3712061Amended CodeCitation Text
39Amended CodeCitation Text
3901New CodeSee Bill Text
390183New CodeSee Bill Text
3901831New CodeSee Bill Text
3901832New CodeSee Bill Text
3901833New CodeSee Bill Text
3923New CodeSee Bill Text
3923235New CodeSee Bill Text
392389New CodeSee Bill Text
3963Amended CodeCitation Text
396301Amended CodeCitation Text
51New CodeSee Bill Text
5164New CodeSee Bill Text
516414New CodeSee Bill Text
51647512New CodeSee Bill Text
51647514New CodeSee Bill Text
5167New CodeSee Bill Text
516712Amended CodeCitation Text
5167121New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback