OH SB26 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Reported: Transportation and Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5534.409 of the Revised Code to designate a portion of State Route 93, in Perry County, as the "Crooksville Firefighters David Theisen and Stephen Carletti Memorial Highway."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate David Theisen and Stephen Carletti Memorial Highway

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseReported: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-05-11HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-05-06HouseIntroduced
2021-05-05SenatePassed
2021-05-05SenateReported: Transportation
2021-01-27SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5534409New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-26
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb26/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb26/RS/01/sb26_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb26/PS/02/sb26_02_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb26/RH/03/sb26_03_RH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15487&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16470&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16524&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16529&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16574&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16592&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16723&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16746&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16743&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-26

Bill Comments 750

feedback