OH SB258 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Effective 2/19/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Effective 2/19/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact new section 3521.01 and sections 3521.011, 3521.012, 3521.013, 3521.014, 3521.015, 3521.016, 3521.017, 3521.018, 3521.019, 3521.0110, 3521.0111, 3521.0112, 3521.0113, 3521.0114, and 3521.0115 and to repeal section 3521.01 of the Revised Code to establish congressional district boundaries for the state based on the 2020 decennial census and to delay certain deadlines related to the 2022 congressional primary election.
Title
Declare intent to establish Congressional districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 55 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-18 | Effective 2/19/22 | |
2021-11-18 | House | Passed |
2021-11-17 | House | Reported: Government Oversight |
2021-11-17 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight |
2021-11-16 | House | Introduced |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Passed |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Local Government and Elections |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 21 | 01 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |