OH SB256 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Effective 7/21/22 - Certain provisions effective 10/19/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Effective 7/21/22 - Certain provisions effective 10/19/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3901.21, 3901.32, 3901.33, 3901.34, 3901.341, 3901.36, 3905.051, 3905.06, 3905.064, 3915.073, 3953.01, 3953.331, and 3953.36 and to enact sections 3901.046, 3901.212, 3901.213, 3901.214, 3901.215, 3905.065, 3905.066, 3905.067, 3905.068, 3905.069, 3905.0610, and 3905.0611 of the Revised Code to amend the law related to travel insurance.
Title
Revise travel insurance law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Effective 7/21/22 - Certain provisions effective 10/19/22 | |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed - Amended |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported - Amended: Insurance |
2022-02-15 | House | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Insurance |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 01 | 046 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 01 | 212 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 213 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 214 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 01 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 01 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 01 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 01 | 341 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 01 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 05 | 051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 05 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 05 | 0610 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 05 | 0611 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 05 | 064 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 05 | 065 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 05 | 066 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 05 | 067 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 05 | 068 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 05 | 069 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 15 | 073 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 53 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 53 | 331 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 53 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |