OH SB25 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-10)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Effective 7/21/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-10)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Effective 7/21/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2925.01 and 2925.03 and to enact section 5.248 of the Revised Code to enhance penalties for certain drug trafficking offenses committed in the vicinity of a substance addiction services provider or a recovering addict, to designate April as "Sexual Assault Prevention Awareness Month," and to name the act's provisions the Relapse Reduction Act.
Title
Enact Relapse Reduction Act regarding drug tests and trafficking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Effective 7/21/22 | |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2021-09-22 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2021-09-16 | House | Introduced |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Passed |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Judiciary |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 25 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |