OH SB243 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-27 - Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight
Pending: House Government Accountability and Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 5162.20 of the Revised Code regarding Medicaid copayment requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards Medicaid copayment requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-27HouseRefer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-11-15HouseIntroduced
2018-11-14SenatePassed
2018-06-06SenateReported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2018-01-17SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2017-12-18SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5162Amended CodeCitation Text
516220Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback