OH SB236 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Enrolled on December 17 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - Amendments laid over under the rule
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3748.04, 3902.30, 4715.70, 4715.71, 4715.72, 4723.94, 4729.01, 4732.33, 4760.08, 4760.09, 4761.17, 4773.01, 4773.061, 5101.26, 5101.27, and 5164.95; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 4731.2910 (4743.09); and to enact sections 3301.531, 3701.1310, 3721.60, 4715.73, 4730.60, 4731.741, 4753.20, 4755.90, 4757.50, 4758.80, 4759.20, 4773.10, 5104.037, and 5119.368 of the Revised Code to revise the laws governing the Ohio Department of Health's Radiation Control Program, the regulation of radiation technology professionals, and the practice of anesthesiologist assistants; to establish and modify requirements regarding the provision of telehealth services; to require the screening of child care and preschool employees for tuberculosis; to require the disclosure of information about certain public assistance recipients to public health authorities; and to exempt certain entities from the notice requirements that apply to mobile dental facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards radiation control and radiation technology professionals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-23SenateAmendments laid over under the rule
2020-12-17HousePassed - Amended
2020-12-02HouseReported - Substitute: Health
2020-05-12HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2020-05-05HouseIntroduced
2020-02-12SenatePassed
2020-02-06SenateReported - Amended: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-11-13SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-11-12SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3301531New CodeSee Bill Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
37011310New CodeSee Bill Text
372160New CodeSee Bill Text
3748Amended CodeCitation Text
374804Amended CodeCitation Text
390230Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
471570Amended CodeCitation Text
471571Amended CodeCitation Text
471572Amended CodeCitation Text
471573New CodeSee Bill Text
472394Amended CodeCitation Text
472901Amended CodeCitation Text
473060New CodeSee Bill Text
47312910Amended CodeCitation Text
4731741New CodeSee Bill Text
473233Amended CodeCitation Text
475320New CodeSee Bill Text
475590New CodeSee Bill Text
475750New CodeSee Bill Text
475880New CodeSee Bill Text
475920New CodeSee Bill Text
476008Amended CodeCitation Text
476009Amended CodeCitation Text
476117Amended CodeCitation Text
4773Amended CodeCitation Text
477301Amended CodeCitation Text
4773061Amended CodeCitation Text
477310New CodeSee Bill Text
510126Amended CodeCitation Text
510127Amended CodeCitation Text
5104037New CodeSee Bill Text
5119368New CodeSee Bill Text
516495Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback