OH SB230 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2521 of the Revised Code to designate April 26 as "Diabetic Ketoacidosis (DKA) Day."
Title
Designate Diabetic Ketoacidosis (DKA) Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Introduced |