OH SB230 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
Pending: House Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-16 - Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
Pending: House Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4501.21 and to enact section 4503.764 of the Revised Code to create the "Medina County" license plate.
Title
Create Medina County license plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2017-12-19 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Passed |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Reported: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 01 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 03 | 764 | New Code | See Bill Text |