OH SB23 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 149.43, 1347.08, 2101.16, 2101.162, 2101.24, 3107.071, 3107.081, 3107.082, 3107.083, 3107.09, 3107.091, 3107.141, 3107.17, 3107.18, 3107.19, 3107.38, 3107.45, 3107.66, 3705.07, 3705.08, 3705.12, 3705.23, 3705.241, 3705.29, 5103.151, and 5103.152, to enact new section 3107.39 and sections 3107.171, 3107.381, 3107.391, 3107.392, 3107.393, 3107.394, 3705.121, 3705.122, 3705.123, 3705.124, 3705.125, and 3705.126, and to repeal sections 3107.39, 3107.40, 3107.41, 3107.42, 3107.43, and 3107.44 of the Revised Code regarding access to adoption records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding access to adoption records.

Sponsors

Rep James Butler [R]Rep Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep Michael Stinziano [D]Rep Nicholas Celebrezze [D]
Rep Margaret Conditt [R]Rep Bill Hayes [R]Rep Thomas Letson [D]Rep Connie Pillich [D]
Rep Peter Stautberg [R]Rep Roland Winburn [D]Rep Marlene Anielski [R]Rep Nickie Antonio [D]
Rep Michael Ashford [D]Rep John Barnes [D]Rep Peter Beck [R]Rep Terry Blair [R]
Sen Edna Brown [D]Rep Armond Budish [D]Rep Jack Cera [D]Rep Mike Dovilla [R]
Rep Mike Duffey [R]Rep Teresa Fedor [D]Rep Mike Foley [D]Rep Ronald Gerberry [D]
Rep Doug Green [R]Rep Christina Hagan [R]Rep Robert Hagan [D]Rep David Hall [R]
Rep Tracy Heard [D]Rep Terry Johnson [R]Rep Stephanie Kunze [R]Rep Matt Lundy [D]
Rep Ross McGregor [R]Rep Zack Milkovich [D]Rep John Patterson [D]Rep Rick Perales [R]
Rep Debbie Phillips [D]Rep Dan Ramos [D]Rep Wes Retherford [R]Rep John Rogers [D]
Rep Margaret Ruhl [R]Rep Kirk Schuring [R]Rep Michael Sheehy [D]Rep Stephen Slesnick [D]
Rep Ryan Smith [R]Rep Robert Sprague [R]Sen Bill Beagle [R]Sen Dave Burke [R]
Sen Troy Balderson [R]Sen Cliff Hite [R]Sen Shannon Jones [R]Sen Frank LaRose [R]
Sen Thomas Patton [R]Sen William Seitz [R]Sen Michael Skindell [D]Sen Charleta Tavares [D]
Sen Randall Gardner [R]Sen Keith Faber [R]Sen Capri Cafaro [D]Sen Edna Brown [D]
Sen Bill Coley [R]Sen Larry Obhof [R]Sen Kevin Bacon [R]Sen John Eklund [R]
Sen Jim Hughes [R]Sen Kris Jordan [R]Sen Peggy Lehner [R]Sen Gayle Manning [R]
Sen Bob Peterson [R]Sen Thomas Sawyer [D]Sen Joe Schiavoni [D]Sen Shirley Smith [D]

Roll Calls

2013-12-11 - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-20 Effective Date
2013-12-19 Governor' Action
2013-12-30 End of 10-day period
2013-12-18 Sent to Governor
2013-12-11 Concurrence
2013-12-04 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2013-12-04 Committee Report* S
2013-02-12 To Civil Justice
2013-02-12 Introduced to House
2013-12-11 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2013-12-11 Committee Report
2013-12-10 To Judiciary
2013-12-10 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
149Amended CodeCitation Text
14943Amended CodeCitation Text
13Amended CodeCitation Text
1347Amended CodeCitation Text
134708Amended CodeCitation Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2101Amended CodeCitation Text
210116Amended CodeCitation Text
2101162Amended CodeCitation Text
210124Amended CodeCitation Text
31Amended CodeCitation Text
3107Amended CodeCitation Text
3107071Amended CodeCitation Text
3107081Amended CodeCitation Text
3107082Amended CodeCitation Text
3107083Amended CodeCitation Text
310709Amended CodeCitation Text
3107091Amended CodeCitation Text
3107141Amended CodeCitation Text
310717Amended CodeCitation Text
310718Amended CodeCitation Text
310719Amended CodeCitation Text
310738Amended CodeCitation Text
310739Repealed CodeCitation Text
310740Repealed CodeCitation Text
310741Repealed CodeCitation Text
310742Repealed CodeCitation Text
310743Repealed CodeCitation Text
310744Repealed CodeCitation Text
310745Amended CodeCitation Text
310766Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3705Amended CodeCitation Text
370507Amended CodeCitation Text
370508Amended CodeCitation Text
370512Amended CodeCitation Text
370523Amended CodeCitation Text
3705241Amended CodeCitation Text
370529Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5103Amended CodeCitation Text
5103151Amended CodeCitation Text
5103152Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback