OH SB224 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 169.02, 2108.75, 2108.77, 2108.81, 2108.82, 3517.152, 3705.20, 4513.17, 4717.04, 4717.05, 4717.06, 4717.07, 4717.10, 4717.13, 4717.14, 4717.24, 4717.28, 4717.30, 4717.35, and 4717.36 and to enact sections 305.43 and 4717.311 of the Revised Code to make changes to the laws that impact funeral homes, funeral professionals, funeral hearses, funeral escort vehicles, preneed funeral contracts, and the parental right of disposition for a deceased adult child, and to require the appointment of alternates to the Ohio Elections Commission.
Title
Revise the law regarding funerals and funeral services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective 9/13/22 | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2022-06-01 | House | Passed - Amended |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported - Substitute: Civil Justice |
2022-03-29 | House | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2022-03-21 | House | Introduced |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Passed |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: General Government Budget Committee |
2021-09-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: General Government Budget Committee |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Commerce
Elections
Health and Human Services
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Local Government
Transportation
Elections
Health and Human Services
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : Local Government
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 69 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 08 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 08 | 77 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 08 | 81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 08 | 82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 05 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 17 | 152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 05 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 13 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 17 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 17 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 17 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 17 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 17 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 17 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 17 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 17 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 17 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 17 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 17 | 311 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 17 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 17 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |