OH SB223 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-12)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-12)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2913.05 and 4719.17 and to enact section 109.88 of the Revised Code to allow the Attorney General to investigate the offenses of unauthorized use of property and telecommunications fraud and to modify the penalties for telecommunications fraud.
Title
To allow the Attorney General to investigate the offenses of unauthorized use of property and telecommunications fraud and to modify the penalties for telecommunications fraud.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - House - House - Conference Committee Report (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Effective Date | |
2012-03-09 | Governor' Action | |
2012-03-19 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-03-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-02-15 | Concurrence | |
2012-02-09 | Conference Committee | |
2011-11-30 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-11-30 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-09-15 | To Judiciary Civil Justice | |
2011-09-15 | Introduced to House | |
2012-01-31 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-01-11 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-12-01 | To Criminal Justice | |
2011-12-01 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 09 | 88 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 13 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 19 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |