OH SB22 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-12)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Effective 3/30/18 - Emergency; effective 3/30/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-12)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Effective 3/30/18 - Emergency; effective 3/30/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3334.01, 3334.02, 3334.08, 3334.09, 3334.18, 3334.19, 3334.20, 5701.11, 5747.01, and 5747.70 of the Revised Code to expressly incorporate changes in the Internal Revenue Code since March 30, 2017, into Ohio law, to allow tax deductible contributions to Ohio 529 plans for K-12 education expenses, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Incorporate Internal Revenue Code changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Effective 3/30/18 - Emergency; effective 3/30/18 | |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2017-02-14 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Ways and Means |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 34 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 34 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 34 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 34 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 34 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 34 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 34 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 01 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |