OH SB217 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-13 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 173.27, 173.38, 173.381, 718.01, and 718.39 of the Revised Code to modify the law regarding access to criminal record check information with respect to long-term care ombudsman programs, direct-care positions, community-based long-term care services, and certain persons serving as a municipal corporation tax administrator, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards criminal background checks for certain professions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-13HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2021-10-12HouseIntroduced
2021-10-06SenatePassed - Amended
2021-09-29SenateReported: Health
2021-09-08SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2021-08-10SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17327Amended CodeCitation Text
17338Amended CodeCitation Text
173381Amended CodeCitation Text
71801Amended CodeCitation Text
71839Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-217
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb217/IN/00/sb217_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb217/RS/01/sb217_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb217/PS/02/sb217_02_PS?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17368&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17404&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17490&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17497&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17524&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17530&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-217

Bill Comments

feedback