OH SB214 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-23)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Passed - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 149.43 and 149.45 and to enact section 2903.32 of the Revised Code to exclude from the definition of public record under the Public Records Law any depiction by photograph, film, videotape, or digital, visual, or printed material of victims of crime under specified circumstances dealing with the victims' bodily privacy, to exclude from that definition specified residential and familial information regarding county or multicounty corrections officers, prohibit female genital mutilation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit female genital mutilation

Sponsors

Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]
Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]
Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]Rep. Nathan Manning [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]
Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]
Rep. Niraj Antani [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]
Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]
Rep. Bill Dean [R]Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]
Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]
Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]
Rep. Wes Retherford [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]
Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]

Roll Calls

2018-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-13HousePassed - Amended
2018-12-12HouseReported - Amended: Criminal Justice
2018-12-11HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2018-12-06HouseIntroduced
2018-12-05SenatePassed
2018-12-03SenateReported - Amended: Judiciary
2017-10-18SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2017-10-05SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
149Amended CodeCitation Text
14943Amended CodeCitation Text
14945Amended CodeCitation Text
29New CodeSee Bill Text
2903New CodeSee Bill Text
290332New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback