OH SB202 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Refer to Committee: Civil Justice
Pending: House Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 2131.03, 2131.031, 2131.032, 2131.033, 2131.034, 2131.035, and 2131.036 of the Revised Code to prohibit a person's disability from being the basis to deny or limit custody, parenting time, visitation, adoption, or service as a guardian or foster caregiver, regarding a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit disability from being used to deny, limit parenting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-31HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2022-05-26HouseIntroduced
2022-05-25SenatePassed
2022-05-25SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2021-06-23SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2021-06-22SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
213103New CodeSee Bill Text
2131031New CodeSee Bill Text
2131032New CodeSee Bill Text
2131033New CodeSee Bill Text
2131034New CodeSee Bill Text
2131035New CodeSee Bill Text
2131036New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-202
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb202/IN/00/sb202_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb202/RS/01/sb202_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb202/PS/02/sb202_02_PS?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17359&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17648&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18811&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19206&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19214&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19243&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19255&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-202

Bill Comments

feedback